KY SB25 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-01 - to Judiciary (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-01 - to Judiciary (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 311.1911 to extend the coverage of the Uniform Anatomical Gift Act to a fetus that was the subject of an induced abortion.
Title
AN ACT relating to abortion.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2016-01-27 | House | received in House |
2016-01-27 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-2 with Committee Substitutes (1) floor amendment (1-title) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 27 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | floor amendment (1-title) filed |
2016-01-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-01-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-01-07 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2016-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |