KY SB240 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - posted in committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 525 to create a new felony of disseminating personally identifying information on the Internet about a minor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the dissemination of personally identifying information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 925 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13Houseposted in committee
2019-03-13Housereturned to Judiciary (H)
2019-03-13House2nd reading
2019-03-13Housetaken from Judiciary (H)
2019-03-12Housereturned to Judiciary (H)
2019-03-12House1st reading
2019-03-12Housetaken from Judiciary (H)
2019-03-12Houseto Judiciary (H)
2019-03-07Housereceived in House
2019-03-07Senate3rd reading, passed 26-10 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-07Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019
2019-03-06Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-05Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2019-03-05Senate1st reading
2019-03-05Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2019-02-27Senatereassigned to State & Local Government (S)
2019-02-19Senateto Judiciary (S)
2019-02-15Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback