KY SB24 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - to Health Services (H)
Pending: House Health Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - to Health Services (H)
Pending: House Health Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 205 to limit the number of managed care organizations contracted by the Department for Medicaid Services to no more than three; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2025.
Title
AN ACT relating to Medicaid managed care.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Meredith [R] | Sen. Danny Carroll [R] | Sen. Donald Douglas [R] | Sen. Rick Girdler [R] |
Sen. Lindsey Tichenor [R] | Sen. Mike Wilson [R] | Sen. David Yates [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2863 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | to Health Services (H) |
2024-01-17 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-17 | House | received in House |
2024-01-16 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-0-1 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 16, 2024 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-01-10 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-01-05 | Senate | to Health Services (S) |
2024-01-02 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-01-02 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Contracts
Drugs and Medicines
Effective Dates, Delayed
Health and Medical Services
Medicaid
Pharmacists
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Medical Assistance
State Agencies
Drugs and Medicines
Effective Dates, Delayed
Health and Medical Services
Medicaid
Pharmacists
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Medical Assistance
State Agencies