KY SB24 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 230 to authorize and direct the Governor to execute an interstate compact on participation in live pari-mutuel horse racing and pari-mutuel wagering activities; define terms; establish compact commission and assign powers and duties; establish rule-making procedure; permit compact commission to charge fees; establish rights and responsibilities of member states, restrictions on authority, and construction, saving, and severability; establish effective provision based upon enactment by at least six states.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the enactment of an interstate racing and wagering compact.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-16 signed by Governor
2011-03-04 delivered to Governor
2011-03-04 enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2011-03-04 passed 37-0
2011-03-04 Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute
2011-03-04 posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute
2011-03-03 received in Senate
2011-03-03 3rd reading, passed 81-18 with Committee Substitute
2011-03-02 posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 3, 2011
2011-03-02 reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill
2011-03-01 posting waived
2011-03-01 returned to Licensing & Occupations (H)
2011-03-01 1st reading
2011-03-01 taken from Licensing & Occupations (H)
2011-02-14 to Licensing & Occupations (H)
2011-02-10 received in House
2011-02-09 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute
2011-02-09 posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 9. 2011
2011-02-09 reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute
2011-02-08 returned to State & Local Government (S)
2011-02-08 2nd reading
2011-02-08 taken from State & Local Government (S)
2011-02-07 returned to State & Local Government (S)
2011-02-07 1st reading
2011-02-07 taken from State & Local Government (S)
2011-01-05 reassigned to State & Local Government (S)
2011-01-04 to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
2011-01-04 introduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback