KY SB231 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - floor amendments (6) to hfa(1), (7) to hfa(4), (8) to hfa(2) and (9-title) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - floor amendments (6) to hfa(1), (7) to hfa(4), (8) to hfa(2) and (9-title) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 164.740 to 164.7891 to create the Work Ready Kentucky Scholarship; require the Kentucky Higher Education Assistance Authority to administer the scholarship in collaboration with the Education and Workforce Development Cabinet; define eligibility requirements for the scholarship; define the scholarship award amount; require the authority to prepare an annual report on the scholarship in collaboration with the Kentucky Center for Education and Workforce Statistics; create the Work Ready Kentucky Scholarship fund; confirm Executive Order 2017-434; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Work Ready Kentucky Scholarship and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Wilson [R] | Sen. George Wise [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 559 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 559 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 559 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | floor amendments (6) to hfa(1), (7) to hfa(4), (8) to hfa(2) and (9-title) filed |
2018-03-27 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 29, 2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-22 | House | floor amendments (1) , (2), (3-title), (4) and (5-title) filed |
2018-03-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-03-21 | House | posted in committee |
2018-03-21 | House | posting waived |
2018-03-21 | House | to Education (H) |
2018-03-20 | House | received in House |
2018-03-19 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 19, 2018 |
2018-03-16 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | reassigned to Education (S) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | introduced in Senate |