KY SB228 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 154)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 154)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 63.200 to change the procedure for filling a vacancy in the office of United States Senator; amend KRS 118. 740 and 118.770 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to a vacancy in Congress.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 416 (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 415 (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1803 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 355 (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1616 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 415 (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1803 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 355 (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1616 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 154) |
2021-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-29 | House | received in Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Bill passed 70-24 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | veto overridden |
2021-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2021-03-29 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | received in House |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill passed 29-8 |
2021-03-29 | House | veto overridden |
2021-03-29 | House | posted for consideration of Governor's veto |
2021-03-29 | House | to Rules (S) |
2021-03-29 | House | received in Senate |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Vetoed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 73-25 |
2021-03-16 | House | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2021-03-15 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2021-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-12 | House | reported favorably, to Rules |
2021-03-11 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-05 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2021-03-05 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-05 | House | 2nd reading |
2021-03-05 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | 1st reading |
2021-03-04 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-03 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-03 | House | received in House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | passed 28-8 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | floor amendments (3) (4) and (5) defeated |
2021-03-02 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2) ruled out of order |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2021-03-01 | Senate | floor amendments (3), (4) and (5) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-03-01 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2021-03-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 1, 2021 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed |
2021-02-23 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-02-22 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | introduced in Senate |