KY SB22 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 304.17A-600 to include the Accreditation Association for Ambulatory Health Care (AAAHC) in the definition of nationally recognized accreditation organizations.
Title
AN ACT relating to utilization reviews.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-09 | Senate | vetoed |
2016-03-29 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-03-29 | Senate | passed 38-0 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-24 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-23 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 24, 2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-17 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-01 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2016-01-27 | House | received in House |
2016-01-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 26 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-01-20 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-01-07 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2016-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |