KY SB218 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 510.120 to provide that a person is guilty of sexual abuse in the second degree when, being a transportation network company driver or a taxicab driver he or she subjects a person who is at least 18 years old and who has hired him or her to provide transportation, to sexual contact.
Title
AN ACT relating to sexual abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 RSN# 1308 (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-03-11 | House | received in House |
2020-03-11 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 30-2 with floor amendment (1) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-05 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-28 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Corrections Impact
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Local Mandate
Motor Carriers
Motor Vehicles
Transportation
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Local Mandate
Motor Carriers
Motor Vehicles
Transportation