KY SB218 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 156 to require the Department of Education to establish an anonymous reporting mechanism for students to report concerns about vaping and other substances in schools; establish policies for the prompt investigation of reports to the anonymous reporting mechanism; encourage local school boards to provide awarness programs to teachers, students, and staff about vaping;
Title
AN ACT relating to prevention of smoking and vaping by students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa 3 RSN# 917 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-13 | House | returned to Health and Family Services (H) |
2019-03-13 | House | 2nd reading |
2019-03-13 | House | taken from Health and Family Services (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | returned to Health and Family Services (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | 1st reading |
2019-03-12 | House | taken from Health and Family Services (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | posted in committee |
2019-03-07 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2019-03-06 | House | received in House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | passed 33-3 with floor amendment (3) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | floor amendments (1) (2-title) (4) and (5) withdrawn |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | floor amendment (5) filed |
2019-03-04 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2019-03-04 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 4, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | floor amendment (4) filed |
2019-02-28 | Senate | floor amendment (1) and (2-title) and (3) filed |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-19 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | introduced in Senate |