KY SB216 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 132)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 132)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
Amend various sections of KRS 407.5101 to 407.5902 to update and conform KRS Chapter 407 regarding jurisdiction and the establishment, enforcement, and modification of interstate family support orders.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Uniform Interstate Family Support Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 132) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2016-04-01 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-04-01 | Senate | passed 36-0 |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitutes (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-24 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-17 | House | posted in committee |
2016-03-14 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2016-03-10 | House | received in House |
2016-03-09 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 9, 2016 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-03 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | introduced in Senate |