KY SB21 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 32)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 32)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 202A.021 to permit voluntary transport to a hospital or psychiatric facility with authorization of the originating and receiving hospital or facility and a patient's signed written agreement to be voluntarily transported and to not be physically removed during transport; amend KRS 645.030 to permit voluntary transport of a child to a hospital or psychiatric facility with authorization of the originating and receiving hospital or facility and a parent if the child is under 16 and parent and child if the child is age 16 or older and a signed written agreement to be voluntarily transported and to not be physically removed during transport; amend KRS 214.185 to establish that any qualified mental health professional may provide outpatient mental health counseling to any child who is age 16 or older and is an unaccompanied youth; amend KRS 645.190 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to mental health treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 277 (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 RSN# 1529 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 RSN# 1529 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 32) |
2021-03-12 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-12 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-12 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-3 |
2021-03-05 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 11, 2021 |
2021-03-05 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-04 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-25 | House | to Health & Family Services (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | received in House |
2021-02-03 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 3, 2021 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-01-13 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2021-01-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-01-08 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Children and Minors
Guardians
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Mental Health
Parental Rights
Physicians and Practitioners
Guardians
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Mental Health
Parental Rights
Physicians and Practitioners