KY SB21 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - returned to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - returned to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 381 to establish definitions for common interest communities which exclude condominiums; prohibit waiver of rights conferred by the bill; impose good faith obligation; establish a requirement to record a declaration for a common interest community with county clerks and set minimum contents of the declaration; limit application to communities created after the effective date or, for existing communities, apply only to events occurring after the effective date; specify that agreements between communities do not create a separate common interest community; require establishment of a unit owners association and specify methods of transfer of developer control to an association; set minimum powers of unit owners associations and boards; set duties and powers of board members; establish minimum requirements for recorded bylaws regarding board and association procedures; establish procedures for calling and conducting association meetings; establish procedures for calling and conducting executive board meetings; define quorum for meetings; create and limit voting methods for unit owners; limit foreclosure action by unit owners association; require records to be kept by association and determine methods of publicizing records; establish procedure for adopting and amending policy rules within the community; specify methods of providing notice to community members; provide for removal of executive board members; require budget and special assessment adoption and publication; allow cause of action to enforce rights and obligations; apply supplemental principles of law and equity.
Title
AN ACT relating to common interest communities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2018-12-14 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Associations
Cities
Civil Procedure
Consumer Affairs
Contracts
Counties
County Clerks
Courts
Deeds and Conveyances
Housing, Building, and Construction
Land Use
Liens
Local Government
Local Mandate
Planning and Zoning
Property
Public Records and Reports
Real Estate
Cities
Civil Procedure
Consumer Affairs
Contracts
Counties
County Clerks
Courts
Deeds and Conveyances
Housing, Building, and Construction
Land Use
Liens
Local Government
Local Mandate
Planning and Zoning
Property
Public Records and Reports
Real Estate