KY SB21 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 12)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 12)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 198A.715 to expand eligibility for funding from the affordable housing trust fund to include sponsors who meet certain requirements and work in connection with rental housing developments that receive low-income tax credits; require the Kentucky Housing Corporation to determine if an applicant for funds is an eligible sponsor that is owned, by majority interest, by a nonprofit organization that materially participates in the development and operation of the rental housing; permit the Kentucky Housing Corporation to amend and determine eligibility rather than the board of directors; make technical corrections regarding the report provided by the Kentucky Housing Corporation to the Interim Joint Committee on Appropriations and Revenue; amend KRS 198A.720 to extend the time the Kentucky Housing Corporation has to review applications for trust fund dollars from 60 days to 90 days; remove trust fund application ranking criteria and transfer the authority to rank applicants to the corporation, in consultation with the advisory committee for the trust fund; increase the percentage allowable to recipients of trust fund money for administrative costs from five percent to seven and one-half percent; allow the board of directors of the corporation to define "rural areas of the Commonwealth," and remove exclusions in statute; repeal KRS 198A.067.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Housing Corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 12) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-11 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2013-03-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-03-07 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2013-03-06 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | taken from Rules |
2013-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-03-05 | House | posting waived |
2013-03-05 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2013-03-05 | House | 1st reading |
2013-03-05 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2013-03-04 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2013-03-01 | House | received in House |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 with committee amendment (1-title) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 28, 2013 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-26 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with committee amendment (1-title) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | reassigned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2013-01-10 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2013-01-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |