KY SB209 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 113)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 113)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 61 to provide that an employer ceasing participation in the Kentucky Employees Retirement System or the County Employees Retirement System as provided by KRS 61.522 that elects to provide an alternative retirement plan with mandatory employee contributions may "pick-up" the employee contributions in the alternative retirement plan so that the contributions will be made on a tax-deferred basis; amend KRS 141.010 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to agencies that discontinue participation in Kentucky Retirement Systems.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Bowen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 113) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2016-04-01 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2016-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2016-03-29 | Senate | passed 37-0 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-23 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-18 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 23, 2016 |
2016-03-18 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-17 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-16 | House | posting waived |
2016-03-10 | House | to State Government (H) |
2016-03-09 | House | received in House |
2016-03-08 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 8, 2016 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-24 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | introduced in Senate |