KY SB205 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 625.041, relating to the appointment of guardian ad litems, to make a technical correction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to guardians ad litem and other court-appointed counsel and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 851 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27Houseto Judiciary (H)
2019-02-26Housereceived in House
2019-02-25Senate3rd reading, passed 23-12 with Committee Substitute (1), floor amendments (1) and (2), and committee amendment (1-title)
2019-02-22Senatefloor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2019-02-22Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2019-02-22Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2019
2019-02-21Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-20Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2019-02-20Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2019-02-19Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2019-02-14Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback