KY SB205 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 139.480 to exempt from sales and use tax tangible personal property purchased by a contractor or subcontractor for incorporation into a structure or improvement to real property under a construction contract with the federal government, state or local government, or a resident, nonprofit educational, charitable, or religious institution.
Title
AN ACT relating to sales and use tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 541 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-03-22 | House | 1st reading |
2018-03-22 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-03-20 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-03-16 | House | received in House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-02-27 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | introduced in Senate |