KY SB205 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-18 - posted in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-18 - posted in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 216.555 to establish language related to the contents of advertising or nongovernmental publications related to long-term care facilities.
Title
AN ACT relating to long-term care facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-18 | House | posted in committee |
2016-03-16 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2016-03-15 | House | received in House |
2016-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 25-13 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2016 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | introduced in Senate |