KY SB20 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 55)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 55)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 205 to define terms, and permit a provider that has exhausted an internal appeals process of a Medicaid managed care organization (MCO) to be entitled to an administrative appeals hearing; require an MCO to send a final determination letter; establish proceedings for an administrative appeals hearing; establish a mechanism for attorneys' fees; establish a fee for the party that does not prevail to cover costs of the proceeding; clarify that this bill applies to all MCO contracts enacted on or after July 1, 2016; amend KRS 13B.020 to include the provider appeals process as a type of administrative hearings to be conducted by the CHFS.
Title
AN ACT relating to Medicaid provider appeals and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 55) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2016-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2016-03-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-28 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2016-03-25 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2016-03-24 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-17 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-16 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2016-02-11 | House | received in House |
2016-02-10 | Senate | passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (2) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Committee Substitute (1) withdrawn |
2016-02-10 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2016-02-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 10, 2016 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | recommitted to Health & Welfare (S) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | taken from Rules |
2016-01-26 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-01-14 | Senate | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2016-01-14 | Senate | taken from Rules |
2016-01-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-01-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-01-07 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2016-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |