KY SB2 | 2021 | 1st Special Sesison
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 5)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 5)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Require visitation in long-term care facilities and residential long-term care facilities to be allowed by family members, legal guardians, outside caregivers, friends, or volunteers who provided regular care and support to the resident prior to the pandemic, who are designated as being important to the mental, physical, or social well-being of a resident in critical situations; require the establishment and operation of COVID-19 antibody administration centers (CAACs) in each Area Development District; require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to assist and support distribution of COVID-19 tests; permit paramedics to be employed by a hospital or nursing facility to work as a licensed paramedic in any department of a hospital or nursing facility subject to conditions; require the cabinet to produce public service announcements and develop strategies to urge vaccination; require the cabinet to create a singular form in accordance with federal law for permits to offer and administer COVID-19 vaccinations to patients; promulgate administrative regulations for safe storage of COVID-19 vaccines; develop and initiate a public awareness campaign to talk to doctors about the benefits of receiving a COVID-19 vaccine; amend KRS 205.636 to update conditions for the requirements for temporary COVID-19 personal care attendants to be placed on the Kentucky Nurse Aide Registry; add new sections to KRS Chapter 13A to declare 902 KAR 2:211E and 902 KAR 2:212E null and void; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to COVID-19 emergency actions and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - House - House: Procedural Vote RCS# 22 (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 30 (Y: 69 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Senate: Veto Override RSN# 1932 (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 25 (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 24 (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 67) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 23 (Y: 33 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 55) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1927 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 30 (Y: 69 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Senate: Veto Override RSN# 1932 (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 25 (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 24 (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 67) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 23 (Y: 33 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 55) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1927 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-10 | House | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 5) |
2021-09-09 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-09-09 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-09-09 | House | received in Senate |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Bill passed 69-22 |
2021-09-09 | Senate | veto overridden |
2021-09-09 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2021-09-09 | Senate | received in House |
2021-09-09 | House | Bill passed 23-5 |
2021-09-09 | House | veto overridden |
2021-09-09 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2021-09-09 | House | received in Senate |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Vetoed |
2021-09-09 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-09-09 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-09-09 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-09-09 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-09-09 | House | passed 69-24 |
2021-09-09 | House | floor amendments (1) (2) and (3) filed |
2021-09-09 | House | 2nd and 3rd readings dispensed with |
2021-09-09 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2021-09-09 | House | substituted for identical House Bill 2 |
2021-09-09 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-09-09 | House | to Health & Family Services (H) |
2021-09-09 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-09-09 | House | received in House |
2021-09-09 | Senate | passed 26-10 with Committee Substitute |
2021-09-09 | Senate | floor amendments (1) (2) (3) (4) (5) (6) and (7) ruled out of order |
2021-09-09 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2021-09-09 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, September 9, 2021 |
2021-09-09 | Senate | floor amendments (8) (9) (10) (11) and (12) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-09-09 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-09-08 | Senate | floor amendments (1), (2), (3), (4), (5), (6), and (7) filed |
2021-09-08 | Senate | returned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2021-09-08 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2021-09-08 | Senate | taken from Health & Welfare (S) |
2021-09-07 | Senate | returned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2021-09-07 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-09-07 | Senate | taken from Health & Welfare (S) |
2021-09-07 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2021-09-07 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-09-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Diseases
Drugs and Medicines
Effective Dates, Emergency
Governor
Health and Medical Services
Nurses
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Health
Diseases
Drugs and Medicines
Effective Dates, Emergency
Governor
Health and Medical Services
Nurses
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Health