KY SB191 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch.142)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 247.090 to expand the membership of the State Fair Board; remove legislative membership on the board; set board member terms; amend KRS 247.100 to remove quorum threshold language; amend KRS 247.110 to set out chair appointment powers of the Governor; set meeting requirements for the State Fair Board; require a majority of voting members of the board to constitute a quorum and adopt bylaws; amend KRS 247.120 to establish the per diem reimbursement rate for board meeting duties; amend KRS 247.140 to require the State Fair Board to hold an annual fair on the state fairgrounds and operate the Kentucky State Fair and World's Championship Horse Show and the National Farm Machinery Show; amend KRS 247.220 to remove the Kentucky Livestock Improvement Association from the Fair Council; clarify membership representation to include the Kentucky Colt Racing Association and Agricultural Education Consultant; add a representative of animal agriculture; amend KRS 247.226 to delete membership requirements of the North American International Livestock Exposition Executive Committee; amend KRS 247.228 to delete membership requirements of the North American International Livestock Exposition Executive Committee subcommittees; repeal KRS 247.200, which prohibits distribution of free passes; abolish the prior State Fair Board and transfer all responsibilities, records, equipment, staff, and budgets to the newly constituted board; nullify the effect of Executive Order 2015-398, dated June 23, 2015; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to reorganization and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-27Senatesigned by Governor (Acts, ch.142)
2016-04-15Senatedelivered to Governor
2016-04-15Senateenrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2016-04-15Senatepassed 38-0
2016-04-15SenateFree Conference Committee report adopted in Senate
2016-04-15Senateposted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Report
2016-04-15SenateFree Conference Committee report filed in Senate
2016-04-15Senatereceived in Senate
2016-04-01Housepassed 94-0
2016-04-01HouseFree Conference Committee report adopted in House
2016-04-01HouseFree Conference Committee report filed in House
2016-04-01HouseFree Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate
2016-04-01HouseConference Committee report adopted in House and Senate
2016-04-01HouseConference Committee report filed in House
2016-03-29HouseConference Committee report filed in Senate
2016-03-29HouseConference Committee appointed in House
2016-03-29HouseHouse refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1)
2016-03-29Houseposted for passage for receding from House Committee Substitute (1)
2016-03-29Housereceived in House
2016-03-28SenateConference Committee appointed in Senate
2016-03-28SenateSenate refused to concur in House Committee Substitute (1)
2016-03-25Senatepassed over and retained for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1)
2016-03-23Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) for Friday, March 25, 2016
2016-03-21Senatereceived in Senate
2016-03-18House3rd reading, passed 75-19 with Committee Substitute (1)
2016-03-11Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2016
2016-03-10House2nd reading, to Rules
2016-03-09Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2016-03-07Houseposted in committee
2016-02-29Houseto Agriculture & Small Business (H)
2016-02-26Housereceived in House
2016-02-25Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0
2016-02-24Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 25, 2016
2016-02-24Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2016-02-23Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2016-02-19Senateto Agriculture (S)
2016-02-17Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback