KY SB191 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-05 - to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 65.7621 to add new definitions; create new sections of KRS 65.7621 to 65.7643 to create the Kentucky 911 Emergency Communications Authority and establish the board of directors; amend KRS 65.7623 to provide the board of directors take over for the CMRS Board; amend KRS 65.7625 to establish an executive director of 911 emergency communications and provide that the director assist with the development of a next generation 911 strategy; amend KRS 65.7627 to establish the 911 fund to be made up of 911 service charges and prepaid wireless service charges; amend KRS 65.7629 to exempt from prepaid wireless services from the 911 service charge and make technical changes; amend KRS 65.7631 to make technical changes; amend KRS 65.7633 to require the board to establish procedures for the submission of a state 911 plan, including the development of a next generation 911 system; create a new section of KRS 65.7621 to 65.7643 requiring the board to recommend an equitable 911 funding procedure before July 1, 2011; amend KRS 65.7635 to conform; amend KRS 65.7635 to remove language relating to prepaid CMRS services, which will take effect on January 1, 2011; create a new section of KRS 65.7621 to 65.7643 to create definitions for this section, provide a mechanism for a 1.4% prepaid wireless service charge to be assessed at the point of sale of prepaid wireless telecommunications services; provide that sellers remit the prepaid wireless service charge to the Department of Revenue, which shall forward the funds to the Kentucky 911 Emergency Communications Authority; amend KRS 65.7639 and 65.7641 to conform; repeal KRS 39G.040; provide that Sections 11 and 12, relating to prepaid wireless service charges, are effective as of January 1, 2011.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to 911 emergency services and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-05 to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2010-03-03 introduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback