KY SB19 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 109)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 109)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 510.050, 510.060, 510.080, 510.090, 510.110, and 510.120 to increase penalties for sex crimes against a victim who is a person with an intellectual disability.
Title
AN ACT relating to sex offenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Danny Carroll [R] | Sen. Tom Buford [R] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] | Sen. Rick Girdler [R] |
Sen. Denise Harper Angel [D] | Sen. Stephen Meredith [R] | Sen. Dennis Parrett [D] | Sen. Mike Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 436 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 501 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 501 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 501 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 501 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 109) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-29 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-29 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2018-03-27 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 29, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-03-12 | House | posted in committee |
2018-03-09 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2018-03-07 | House | received in House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 6, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-01 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-01-03 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2018-01-02 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |