KY SB18 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-03 - floor amendment (3) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-03 - floor amendment (3) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 311.377 to add medical malpractice actions, actions arising out of review of credentials or retrospective review and evaluation, and actions by an applicant for or grantee of staff privileges to materials that are confidential and privileged and not subject to discovery, subpoena, or introduction into evidence, in any civil action in any court.
Title
AN ACT relating to medical review organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | House | floor amendment (3) filed |
2017-03-02 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017 |
2017-03-02 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-01 | House | floor amendment (1) and (2-title) filed |
2017-03-01 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-27 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-14 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2017-02-10 | House | received in House |
2017-02-09 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 22-12 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 9, 2017 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2017-01-07 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2017-01-04 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2017-01-04 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-01-04 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-01-03 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |