KY SB178 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new sections of KRS Chapter 367 to regulate advertising for legal services.
Title
AN ACT relating to deceptive lawsuit advertising and solicitation practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1303 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-03-10 | House | received in House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | passed 21-13 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2020-03-10 | Senate | floor amendment (1) ruled not germane |
2020-03-10 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2020-03-09 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2020-03-09 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-05 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 9, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-03 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-20 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Advertising
Attorneys
Corrections Impact
Local Mandate
Occupations and Professions
Trade Practices and Retailing
Attorneys
Corrections Impact
Local Mandate
Occupations and Professions
Trade Practices and Retailing