KY SB176 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 147)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 147)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Retain original provisions, except create a working group on facial technology; set membership, require the working group to adopt a model facial recognition technology policy by January 1, 2024, to govern use of facial recognition technology: set forth standards and components of the policy; require law enforcement agencies that use the technology to have a use policy in place.
Title
AN ACT relating to use of facial recognition technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 520 (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2169 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2169 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 147) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-4 |
2022-03-29 | House | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2022-03-29 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-25 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2022-03-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-03-23 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2022-03-22 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-22 | House | received in House |
2022-03-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 21, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-03-11 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-10 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Boards and Commissions
Courts
Criminal Procedure
Local Mandate
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Technology
Courts
Criminal Procedure
Local Mandate
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Technology