KY SB174 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 113)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 161.1211 to allow national board certification to qualify a teacher for Rank II status; change Rank I requirements to reflect the change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to elementary and secondary teachers and principals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 362 (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, scta1 RSN# 1307 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-24Senatesigned by Governor (Acts Ch. 113)
2020-04-15Senatedelivered to Governor
2020-04-15Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-04-15Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-04-15Senatereceived in Senate
2020-04-14House3rd reading, passed 85-2
2020-04-14Houseplaced in the Orders of the Day
2020-04-14Housetaken from Rules
2020-04-01House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-26Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-03-26Houseposting waived
2020-03-17Houseto Education (H)
2020-03-11Housereceived in House
2020-03-11Senate3rd reading, passed 33-0 with Committee Substitute (1) committee amendment (1-title)
2020-03-10Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2020
2020-03-06Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-05Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-02-18Senateto Education (S)
2020-02-13Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback