KY SB17 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 53)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS 311.530 to 311.620 to prohibit the Board of Medical Licensure from requiring any maintenance of certification and related continuing education requirements for licensure as a physician.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to physicians.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-08Senatesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 53)
2016-03-29Senatedelivered to Governor
2016-03-29Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2016-03-25Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2016-03-25Senatereceived in Senate
2016-03-24House3rd reading, passed 96-0
2016-03-23Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 24, 2016
2016-03-23House2nd reading, to Rules
2016-03-22Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2016-03-17Houseposted in committee
2016-02-08Houseto Health & Welfare (H)
2016-02-04Housereceived in House
2016-02-03Senate3rd reading, passed 36-0
2016-02-01Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 3
2016-01-27Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2016-01-26Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2016-01-07Senateto Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
2016-01-06Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback