KY SB17 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 26)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 26)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 510.110, relating to sexual abuse in the first degree, to prohibit certain persons employed by or associated with an agency or facility responsible for detention or treatment from having sexual contact with persons incarcerated, supervised, evaluated, or treated by those agencies; amend KRS 510.120 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to crimes and punishments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 26) | |
2010-03-23 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-03-23 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2010-03-22 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2010-03-22 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-22 | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 | |
2010-03-18 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 19, 2010 | |
2010-03-18 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-17 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-03-15 | posted in committee | |
2010-03-11 | to Judiciary (H) | |
2010-03-10 | received in House | |
2010-03-09 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-03-08 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-05 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-04 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-01-06 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in Senate | |
2010-11-04 | To: Interim Joint Committee on Judiciary |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB17.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB17/bill.doc |