KY SB162 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 189.635 to define "law enforcement agency"; allow law enforcement agencies to retain copies of accident reports filed with the State Police; allow law enforcement agencies access to vehicle accident reports, and allow them to contract with third parties to provide the reports to other entities that are eligible to receive them under the section; make technical corrections.
Title
AN ACT relating to vehicle accident reports.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Mills [R] | Sen. Phillip Wheeler [R] | Sen. Danny Carroll [R] | Sen. Brandon Storm [R] |
Sen. Johnnie Turner [R] | Sen. Steve West [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 351 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2922 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2922 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | Senate | signed by Governor |
2024-03-26 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-26 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-26 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 92-0 |
2024-03-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 25, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2024-02-22 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-22 | House | received in House |
2024-02-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 21, 2024 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Motor Vehicles
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County
Public Records and Reports
Technical Corrections
Transportation
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County
Public Records and Reports
Technical Corrections
Transportation