KY SB162 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - recommitted to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - recommitted to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 83A requiring all mayors and legislative body members in cities of the home rule class to undergo a mandatory three-hour block of instruction concerning various duties and obligations; establish criteria for training and provide for training; establish filing requirements; establish penalty for failure to comply; require any mayor or legislative body members to receive training within one year of the effective date of this Act.
Title
AN ACT relating to the training of city officials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | recommitted to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-17 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | floor amendment (2) filed |
2020-03-09 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-13 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | introduced in Senate |