KY SB16 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 156.160 to allow computer programming language courses to be accepted as meeting foreign language requirements in the public schools; amend KRS 164.002 to define "computer programming language"; amend KRS 164.4785 to ensure that computer programming language courses be accepted as meeting foreign language requirements for admission to public postsecondary institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to computer science programs in public schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-11Housetaken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
2015-03-11Housefloor amendments (5) and (6-title) filed
2015-03-10Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015
2015-03-10Housefloor amendments (1) (2-title) (3) and (4-title) filed
2015-03-09Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill
2015-03-03Houseposting waived
2015-03-03Houseposted in committee
2015-03-03Housereturned to Education (H)
2015-03-03House1st reading
2015-03-03Housetaken from Education (H)
2015-02-24Houseto Education (H)
2015-02-23Housereceived in House
2015-02-20Senate3rd reading, passed 33-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title)
2015-02-19Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 20, 2015
2015-02-13Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2015-02-12Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title)
2015-02-03Senateto Education (S)
2015-01-08Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback