KY SB156 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 55)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 55)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.0207 to establish a statewide reading research center; direct the center and the Kentucky Department of Education to establish annual goals and performance objectives; require KDE to make annual programming and funding recommendations for the center; require KDE to select the center through a competitive proposal process by July 1, 2024, for a five-year contract; amend KRS 151B.406, 151B.409, 154A.130, 156.553, 158.305, 158.792, 158.840, and 164.035 to conform; make Sections 1 through 9 of the Act take effect July 1, 2024.
Title
AN ACT relating to a statewide reading research center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 248 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2570 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2570 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 55) |
2023-03-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2023-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-03-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 |
2023-03-14 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-13 | House | recommitted to Education (H) |
2023-03-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2023-03-10 | House | to Education (H) |
2023-03-08 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-08 | House | received in House |
2023-03-08 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35 -0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 08, 2023 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | introduced in Senate |