KY SB156 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - to Education (H)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - to Education (H)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 158.810 to 158.818 directing the Kentucky Department of Education to develop a plan to transition all state-operated secondary vocational education centers to local school districts by July 1, 2024; require the Commissioner of Education to establish and appoint members to a workgroup to help develop and implement the plan; describe what the plan shall include; require the Kentucky Board of Education to approve the plan; require the department to provide an annual report to the Interim Joint Committee on Education.
Title
AN ACT relating to career and technical education.
Sponsors
Sen. Jimmy Higdon [R] | Sen. David Givens [R] | Sen. Mike Nemes [R] | Sen. Mike Wilson [R] |
Sen. George Wise [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1251 (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | to Education (H) |
2020-02-26 | House | received in House |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 30-7 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-02-21 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-02-20 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-02-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 20, 2020 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |