KY SB152 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - to Health & Welfare (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS 311.710 to 311.820 to require an ultrasound prior to an abortion; amend KRS 311.990 to provide a criminal penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to full disclosure in public safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-02Houseto Health & Welfare (H)
2016-03-01Housereceived in House
2016-02-29Senate3rd reading, passed 32-4
2016-02-29Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 29, 2016
2016-02-12Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2016-02-11Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2016-02-08Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2016-02-04Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback