KY SB151 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 107)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 65.240, relating to interlocal agreements, KRS 74.407, relating to water districts, KRS 76.080, relating to metropolitan sewer districts, KRS 76.231, relating to joint sewer agencies, KRS 76.325, relating to sewer construction districts, and create a new section of KRS 220.010 to 220.540, relating to sanitation districts, to allow each agency or entity to contract with other entities to acquire wastewater facilities in connection with the acquisition, construction, operation, repair, or maintenance when the entity's facilities are outside of that particular agency's jurisdictional boundaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the local provision of wastewater services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Motion to Table RSN# 687 (Y: 13 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - House - House: Appeal the Ruling of the Chair RCS# 430 (Y: 58 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/HCS 1, HTCA 1 RSN# 688 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 434 (Y: 49 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: Consider Motion RCS# 433 (Y: 52 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 432 (Y: 43 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - House - House: Table RCS# 431 (Y: 36 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 543 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 543 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10Senatesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 107)
2018-03-29Senatedelivered to Governor
2018-03-29Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-03-29Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-03-29SenateBill passed 22-15
2018-03-29SenateSenate concurred in House Committee Substitute & committee amendment (1-title)
2018-03-29Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute & committee amendment (1-title)
2018-03-29Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-29House3rd reading, passed 49-46 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
2018-03-29Housefloor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-03-29Houseplaced in the Consent Orders of the Day
2018-03-29Housetaken from Rules
2018-03-29Housereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute & committee amendment (1-title)
2018-03-21Housereturned to State Government (H)
2018-03-21House2nd reading
2018-03-21Housetaken from State Government (H)
2018-03-20Houseposted in committee
2018-03-20Houseto State Government (H)
2018-03-20Housereturned to Committee on Committees (H)
2018-03-20House1st reading
2018-03-20Housetaken from Committee on Committees (H)
2018-03-19Housereceived in House
2018-03-16Senate3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-03-15Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 16, 2018
2018-03-14Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-03-13Senatereturned to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2018-03-13Senate2nd reading
2018-03-13Senatetaken from Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2018-03-12Senatereturned to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2018-03-12Senate1st reading
2018-03-12Senatetaken from Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2018-02-16Senateto Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2018-02-15Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback