KY SB150 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 73)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 73)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 304.17A-005 to define terms; create new sections of Subtitle 17A of KRS Chapter 304 to require the commissioner of insurance to establish a database of billed health care service charges; require an insurer to reimburse for unanticipated out-of-network care; prohibit balance billing from a provider who has been reimbursed as required; provide for an independent dispute resolution program to review reimbursements provided for unanticipated out-of-network care; allow unregulated health plans to opt-in to requirements; require insurers to provide certain notices in an explanation of benefits; amend KRS 304.17A-254 and 304.17A-505 to require certain disclosures; create a new section of KRS Chapter 365 to allow the Attorney General to enjoin persons violating Section 3; amend KRS 18A.225 to require the state employee health plan to comply with Sections 3 and 4 of the Act; amend KRS 304.17A-0954, 304.17A-096, 304.17A-500, 304.17A-580, 304.17A-649, 304.17B-001, 304.17B-015, 304.17B-033, 304.17C-010, 304.18-114, 304.38A-010, and 304.39-241 to conform; repeal KRS 304.17A-640; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2021.
Title
AN ACT relating to the state of emergency in response to COVID-19 and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/fccr FINAL PASSAGE RSN# 1421 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 325 (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 277 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, sfa1 RSN# 1279 (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 325 (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 277 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, sfa1 RSN# 1279 (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 73) |
2020-03-26 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-26 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-26 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-26 | Senate | passed 30-0 |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Free Conference Committee Report adopted in Senate |
2020-03-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-26 | House | passed 82-0 |
2020-03-26 | House | Free Conference Committee Report adopted in House |
2020-03-26 | House | Free Conference Committee Report filed in House and Senate |
2020-03-26 | House | Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2020-03-26 | House | Conference Committee Report adopted in House and Senate |
2020-03-26 | House | Conference Committee Report filed in House and Senate |
2020-03-26 | House | Conference Committee appointed in House |
2020-03-26 | House | House refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-26 | House | posted for passage for receding from House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-26 | House | to Rules (H) |
2020-03-26 | House | received in House |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed in Senate |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-19 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 84-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-19 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-19 | House | posting waived |
2020-03-18 | House | returned to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2020-03-18 | House | 2nd reading |
2020-03-18 | House | taken from Banking & Insurance (H) |
2020-03-17 | House | returned to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2020-03-17 | House | 1st reading |
2020-03-17 | House | taken from Banking & Insurance (H) |
2020-03-09 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | received in House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 30-3 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 4, 2020 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-02-13 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Attorney General
Effective Dates, Delayed
Health Benefit Mandate
Insurance, Health
Physicians and Practitioners
State Agencies
State Employees
Attorney General
Effective Dates, Delayed
Health Benefit Mandate
Insurance, Health
Physicians and Practitioners
State Agencies
State Employees