KY SB143 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 158.175 to require moments of silence or reflection at the start of each school day and establish guidelines.
Title
AN ACT relating to moments of silence and reflection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | recommitted to Education (S) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-11 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-05 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/sb143.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/sb143/orig_bill.pdf |