KY SB136 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - to Rules (S)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 216 to require direct-care staff who provide care for a client with Alzheimer's or another form of dementia within the client's home to receive initial and ongoing training that is approved by the Cabinet for Health and Family Services; require employers to provide cabinet-approved training and certificates of completion to direct-care staff who work with clients with Alzheimer's or another form of dementia; require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to promulgate administrative regulations to implement, monitor, and enforce the requirements of this section and to establish standards for approved trainings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to home health aides.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 380 (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, scta1 RSN# 1270 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-15Senateto Rules (S)
2020-04-15Senatereceived in Senate
2020-04-15House3rd reading, passed 86-3 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-04-15Houseplaced in the Orders of the Day
2020-04-15Housefloor amendment (10) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-04-15Housetaken from Rules (H)
2020-04-15Housereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-04-15Houseposting waived
2020-04-15Houserecommitted to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
2020-04-14Housefloor amendments (1),(2-title),(3),(4-title),(5),(6-title),(7),(8) and (9-title) filed to bill
2020-03-19Housereported favorably, to Rules
2020-03-18Housereturned to Health and Family Services (H)
2020-03-18House2nd reading
2020-03-18Housetaken from Health and Family Services (H)
2020-03-17Houseposting waived
2020-03-17Housereturned to Health and Family Services (H)
2020-03-17House1st reading
2020-03-17Housetaken from Health and Family Services (H)
2020-03-05Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2020-03-03Housereceived in House
2020-03-03Senate3rd reading, passed 36-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-03-02Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2020-02-28Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2020
2020-02-27Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-26Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-02-05Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2020-02-03Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback