KY SB136 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - posted in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 218A.020. 218A.070, and 218A.090 to classify all hydrocodone products as Schedule II controlled substances; amend KRS 314.011 relating to advanced practice registered nurses and KRS 320.210 and 320.240 relating to optometrists to preserve their existing prescriptive authority relative to hydrocodone-based products; amend KRS 218A.1430 to increase penalties for possession of, and trafficking in, synthetic drugs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to controlled substances.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-14Houseposted in committee
2016-02-22Houseto Judiciary (H)
2016-02-19Housereceived in House
2016-02-18Senate3rd reading, passed 35-1-1 with Committee Substitute (1)
2016-02-17Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 18, 2016
2016-02-12Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2016-02-11Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2016-02-01Senateto Judiciary (S)
2016-01-28Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback