KY SB135 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 39)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 39)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.092 to revise the definition of "formula base amount"; establish a definition of "funding floor" for purposes of priority funding for postsecondary institutions; add a hold-harmless provision for fiscal year 2021-2022 and thereafter; add a stop-loss provision of 0% for fiscal year 2021-2022 and thereafter; establish how amounts distributed from the performance fund shall be treated in the biennial budget process.
Title
AN ACT relating to the postsecondary education performance fund and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1679 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 226 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 1577 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 226 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 1577 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 39) |
2021-03-12 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-11 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-11 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Bill passed 33-0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) on Thursday, March 11, 2021 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2021-03-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 with Committee Substitute |
2021-03-04 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2021-03-02 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-02 | House | to Education (H) |
2021-02-26 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-26 | House | received in House |
2021-02-25 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 25, 2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-11 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | introduced in Senate |