KY SB135 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - to Education (H)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Confirm Executive Order 2018-598 and Executive Order 2018-883, which reorganize various offices in the Department of Education; amend various KRS sections to conform; repeal KRS 156.017 to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to reorganization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 829 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25Houseto Education (H)
2019-02-22Housereceived in House
2019-02-21Senate3rd reading, passed 36-0
2019-02-19Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2019
2019-02-15Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-14Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-07Senateto Education (S)
2019-02-05Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback