KY SB134 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 164.740 to 164.7891 to establish the Optometry Scholarship Program; define scholarship eligibility requirements; direct the Kentucky Higher Education Assistance Authority to promulgate regulations and administer the program; create the Optometry Scholarship Program fund; APPROPRIATION.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the Optometry Scholarship Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-19 - House - House: For Consent RCS# 318 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfta 1 RSN# 1238 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27Senatesigned by Governor
2020-03-19Senatedelivered to Governor
2020-03-19Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-03-19Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-03-19Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-19House3rd reading, passed 84-0
2020-03-18Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020
2020-03-17House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-12Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-03-09Houseposted in committee
2020-02-21Houseto Education (H)
2020-02-19Housereceived in House
2020-02-19Senate3rd reading, passed 33-0 with floor amendment (1-title)
2020-02-18Senatefloor amendment (1-title) filed
2020-02-18Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 19, 2020
2020-02-14Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-13Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-02-05Senateto Education (S)
2020-02-03Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback