KY SB128 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 108)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 108)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allow public high school students currently enrolled in Kentucky to request to use the 2021-2022 school year as a supplemental school year to retake and supplement coursework already completed; require local boards of education to either approve or deny all requests; allow Kentucky nonpublic schools to also implement supplemental school years; ensure students utilizing supplemental school years are not ineligible to participate in KHSAA activities; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to supplementary education and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 357 (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1610 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1610 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 108) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 92-5 |
2021-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-03-04 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-03 | House | to Education (H) |
2021-03-03 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-03 | House | received in House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 2, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-25 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Athletics
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Effective Dates, Emergency
Fiscal Note
Athletics
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Effective Dates, Emergency
Fiscal Note