KY SB126 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 126)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 126)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 16.505, 61.510 and 78.510 to define final compensation to allow state and county employees, who entered the retirement systems on or after September 1, 2008, but prior to January 1, 2014, to use partial fiscal years, which may contain less than 12 months of service credit, to reach a final compensation calculation that is at least 60 months for non-hazardous employees and at least 36 months for hazardous employees.
Title
AN ACT relating to the final compensation calculation for state and county employees entering the retirement systems on or after September 1, 2008.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 126) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2017-03-14 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as Consent Bill |
2017-03-07 | House | returned to Local Government (H) |
2017-03-07 | House | 1st reading |
2017-03-07 | House | taken from Local Government (H) |
2017-03-06 | House | posted in committee |
2017-03-03 | House | posted in committee |
2017-03-01 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2017-02-28 | House | received in House |
2017-02-27 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 27, 2017 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-08 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |