KY SB125 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 028)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 028)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 258.015 to delete requirement on landowners to capture or vaccinate feral cats.
Title
AN ACT relating to feral cats.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 269 (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 812 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 812 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 028) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-07 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-4 |
2019-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2019-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2019-03-01 | House | returned to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H) |
2019-03-01 | House | 1st reading |
2019-03-01 | House | taken from Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H) |
2019-02-21 | House | to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | received in House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2019-02-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2019 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-07 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |