KY SB124 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 112)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 218A.010 to exempt from the definition of "marijuana" drugs used in FDA-approved studies or compassionate use programs and the substance cannabidiol when recommended by a physician practicing at a state research hospital.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to drugs and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-10Senatesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 112)
2014-03-31Senatedelivered to Governor
2014-03-31Senateenrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2014-03-31Senatepassed 36-0
2014-03-31SenateSenate concurred in House Committee Substitute
2014-03-31Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute for Monday, March 31, 2014
2014-03-31Senateto Rules (S)
2014-03-26Senatereceived in Senate
2014-03-26House3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute
2014-03-20Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 21, 2014
2014-03-20House2nd reading, to Rules
2014-03-19Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2014-03-17Houseposted in committee
2014-03-17Houseto Judiciary (H)
2014-03-13Housereceived in House
2014-03-12Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0 with floor amendments (1) and (2)
2014-03-11Senatefloor amendment (2) filed
2014-03-11Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2014-03-10Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 11, 2014
2014-03-04Senatefloor amendment (1) filed
2014-02-27Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2014-02-26Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2014-02-07Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2014-02-05Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback