KY SB123 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - received in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - received in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 226.010 to define pledgor; amend KRS 226.040 to expand registry requirements associated with pawn transactions, prohibit pawn transactions with persons unwilling or unable to provide required identification, and require submission of information to the Department of Kentucky State Police or contracted vendor; create a new section of KRS Chapter 17 to require the Department of Kentucky State Police to establish or contract for the provision of a pawn database services.
Title
AN ACT relating to pawnbrokers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-25 | 3rd reading, passed 98-1 with Committee Substitute, committee amendments (1) and (2-title) | |
2010-03-24 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 25, 2010 | |
2010-03-23 | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent bill with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (2-title) | |
2010-03-23 | posting waived retroactively | |
2010-03-22 | recommitted to Licensing & Occupations (H) | |
2010-03-17 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 18, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-10 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with committee amendment (1) | |
2010-03-08 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-08 | to Military Affairs & Public Safety (H) | |
2010-02-03 | received in House | |
2010-02-03 | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2010-02-03 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 3, 2010 | |
2010-02-03 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute | |
2010-02-02 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-02-02 | returned to Committee on Committees (S) | |
2010-02-02 | 2nd reading | |
2010-02-02 | taken from committee | |
2010-02-01 | returned to Committee on Committees (S) | |
2010-02-01 | 1st reading | |
2010-02-01 | taken from committee | |
2010-02-01 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB123.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB123/bill.doc |