KY SB12 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - posted in committee
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]


Create a new section of KRS Chapter 2 to designate and observe May 1 of every year as "School Bus Driver Day."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


AN ACT relating to Kentucky school bus drivers.



2018-02-15Houseposted in committee
2018-02-01Houseto Transportation (H)
2018-01-30Housereceived in House
2018-01-29Senate3rd reading, passed 34-2
2018-01-26Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 29, 2018
2018-01-25Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-01-24Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2018-01-03Senateto Transportation (S)
2018-01-02Senateintroduced in Senate
2017-05-15SenatePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Kentucky State Sources

Bill Comments