KY SB12 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - to Licensing & Occupations (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #7) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - to Licensing & Occupations (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #7) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 243.050 to allow a major sporting venue to sell alcohol outside the prevailing times for local sales of alcohol, including Sunday, if the venue is hosting an event that will begin outside the normal hours for alcohol sales, has a seating capacity of 75,000 or more, holds an NQ1 license, an extended hours supplemental license, and a Sunday retail drink license, and is not licensed under KRS Chapter 230.
Title
AN ACT relating to the extended hours supplemental license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | House | to Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2016-01-15 | House | received in House |
2016-01-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 28-8-1 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 14 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-01-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-01-07 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2016-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |