KY SB12 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - recommitted to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - recommitted to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 141.023 to make a technical correction.
Title
AN ACT relating to revenue.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | recommitted to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) | |
2012-03-14 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | |
2012-03-14 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 14, 2012 | |
2012-03-13 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2012-03-08 | returned to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) | |
2012-03-08 | 2nd reading | |
2012-03-08 | taken from Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) | |
2012-03-07 | returned to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) | |
2012-03-07 | 1st reading | |
2012-03-07 | taken from Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) | |
2012-03-07 | reassigned to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) | |
2012-02-27 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2012-02-23 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB12.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB12/bill.doc |